Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER-IN-THANET
Charity number: 1133847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew Hodder | Chair | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Stickels | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dunn | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GEOFFREY BAKER | Trustee | 20 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Reid | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alice Bates | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Parkins | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Toni Lawrence | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roy Brown | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill Horne | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bridges | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robin Clive Page | Trustee | 15 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUNE BINFIELD | Trustee | 28 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MILLS | Trustee | 28 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.