Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY WITH ALL SOULS, KILBURN AND SAINT JAMES, WEST HAMPSTEAD.
Charity number: 1133996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Thompson | Chair | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nelissa Mendy | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD THOMAS RAINBOW | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Laurel Hunte | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Mx Rafael Carter | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Aagaard Nielsen | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Slade | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carleen Kerr-Larrington | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Funmilayo Akinbinu | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Issabella Gyebi | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANE IRENE ASHBY | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROSS HUTCHISON | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
FLORENCE YATELEY BRUCE-ANNAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANN O'SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NANCY JIRIRA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.