Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S PRESCOT
Charity number: 1135804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kimberley Mannings | Chair | 23 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
John Eric Orme | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Anne Bunting | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Nicola Peers | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Pauline Jessop | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Raymond Mercer | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Anne Priestley | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Norine Catherine Jones | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Appleton | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Mary Julia Oldfield | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Steven Martin | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Keith James Porter | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Claire Louise Portsmouth | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Pye | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Andrew Kernick | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Lesley Porter | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Eileen Valerie Sugden | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Ellington | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CANON GEOFFREY ALMOND | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.