Financial history UPPER STRATTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1133910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £89.78k £88.28k £94.76k £140.79k £63.12k
Total expenditure £91.86k £90.17k £92.95k £92.80k £81.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £200 £350 £250 £2.77k