Trustees SWANSEA & GOWER METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
47 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Paul Everett | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Audrey Jean Hinnells | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Winifred Audrey Louise Hawkins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
MARK PUNTAN | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|||||||
Isobel Everett | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Lawrence Dyer | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Laura Marian Honour | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Marilyn Harry | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLINE BUCKLER | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Margaret Joy Adams | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Irene Dendle | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Cuthill | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Cynthia Mumford | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Grace Coleman BSC Hons | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Eleanor Rachel Cuthill | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Frederick Jones | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Keith George Morris | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
LARRAINE GILLIAN WORRALL | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
NANCY DRYCE OWENS | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Davies | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Leslie John Want | Trustee | 22 July 2012 |
|
|||||||
Rev ANDREW WALKER | Trustee | 22 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ALAN CRAM | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|||||||
MARJORIE PROBERT | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
IAN CAMPBELL | Trustee | 01 January 2006 |
|
|
||||||
Geoff Maddock | Trustee | 02 April 2004 |
|
|
||||||
ROSEMARY ELAINE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JEFFREY STUART COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RUTH PAINTER FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BRINLEY WYNNE JONES BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SANDRA PENGELLY SRN SCM HV | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SYBIL IVY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER SCOTT BA PGCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANDREW PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
KATHLEEN MARGARET JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BEVERLEY POINER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Janet Mary Neilson | Trustee |
|
||||||||
REV. H.D. LONG | Trustee |
|
||||||||
REV PAMELA MARY CRAM BA MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID JOHN BOAKES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MALCOLM GRIMLEY HNC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CAROLYN MARY JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HILDEGARDE ANN ROBERTS BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HEATHER ANN COLEMAN BSC CQSW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SELINA TAYLOR BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BLODWEN ROSAMOND O'CONNOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.