Financial history BADMINTON ROAD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1134071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £110.85k £57.70k £52.33k £47.66k £34.17k
Total expenditure £96.06k £61.96k £73.32k £46.26k £38.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A