Financial history LONDON ROAD METHODIST CHURCH, HORSHAM

Charity number: 1134052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £110.39k £108.12k £97.64k £101.25k £87.64k
Total expenditure £121.80k £112.26k £101.91k £99.15k £83.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A