Trustees WIRKSWORTH MUSIC CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1137242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GABRIEL BABENKO | Chair | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Chad Bean | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Katherine Warren | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Ranald Fraser Macdonald | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elizabeth Ahearne | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Michelle Richards-Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Reeves | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mathias Graf | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Bisset BA PGCE | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA DENISE BODDY BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JENNIFER ACONS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.