Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. NICHOLAS, CRAMLINGTON
Charity number: 1133848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV William Sales Hill Docherty | Chair | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Laybourne | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kit Tapscott | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Agnes Docherty | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Maxwell | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aidan David Brierley | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Leigh Rebel | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Stewart | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol-Ann Grey | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Wyness | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Brierley | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhona Simpson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Maxwell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dilys Mary Nicholls | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.