Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOSFORTH ST NICHOLAS
Charity number: 1133837
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Louise Haigh | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane McLaughlin | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Anthony Baker | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Wake | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ron Black | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Molly Rebecca Allan | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr SallyAnn Ritchie | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barnaby John Coulson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ella Lucy Vickers | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Joseph Thirlaway | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tait | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Michael Proudfoot | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Harrison | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dale Hunter | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM PALMER BARNARD | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Olwyn Black | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr Cecilia Holmes | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK WHITE OLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN TODD TAIT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.