Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CHAD, LICHFIELD

Charity number: 1134015
Charity reporting is up to date (184 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PETER RODNEY CLARK Chair 02 October 2012
ST CHAD'S FOUNDATION TRUST
Received: On time
Roger Melvyn Keay Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Kate Elizabeth Bowers Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Timothy Webb Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
CELIA RICHARDSON Trustee 24 January 2019
THE MOTHERS' UNION DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD
Overdue by 231 days
J H HAYES TRUST (TRUST 1086)
Overdue by 231 days
Mathew Webb Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Megan Naomi Siner Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Paul Fellows Trustee 10 April 2016
None on record
MARY THERESA WILSON Trustee 10 April 2016
None on record
PAMELA IRENE OAKLEY Trustee 30 September 2012
None on record
Caroline Ann Fellows Trustee 30 September 2012
CURBOROUGH (LICHFIELD) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: 103 days late
CURBOROUGH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
LILAS RAWLING Trustee 30 September 2012
None on record
KATHERINE MARGARET COTTON Trustee
None on record
MR TUG WILSON Trustee
THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time