Financial history BLOCKLEY HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1133319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £11.48k £12.22k £12.17k £13.94k £10.56k
Total expenditure £18.99k £11.38k £11.20k £9.67k £9.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A