Trustees THE MOLD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity number: 500708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
bryan webb | Chair | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Morgan | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Colby-Browne | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bevan | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Owens | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
LEWIS ANNE | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
joy heard | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MCLEAN | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Eluned Mair Kaye | Trustee | 06 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
MR RAY CHESTERS | Trustee | 01 October 1979 |
|
|
||||
R G CHESTERS | Trustee | 01 October 1979 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KATH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRIS ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAM MILLINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN FROST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TEGWEN HUGHES-ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.