Trustees Whitfield Parochial Church Council (Glossop)
Charity number: 1134145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Chris Neilson | Chair | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gregory | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Graham Bowes | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan James Edge | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Swindells | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Christopher Galvin | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Williams | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Humphrey | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Collard | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Richardson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hackett | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Eleanor Cahill | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Burston | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Kindleysides | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.