Trustees PADDOCK WOOD ATHLETIC CLUB
Charity number: 1139343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Harris | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Tolhurst | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Liz Duffin | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Ridger | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MIKE RIDGER | Trustee | 26 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
MICK DUFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENNY ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY BATCHELDER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.