ISLINGTON CENTRE FOR REFUGEES AND MIGRANTS

Charity number: 1135205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £100.86k £221.02k £262.89k £245.49k £365.63k
Total expenditure £154.11k £175.08k £214.02k £245.22k £289.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k