RESTORE HOPE FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1138447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.97k £3.96k £2.82k £3.62k £5.71k
Total expenditure £1.49k £2.97k £4.81k £2.59k £917
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A