Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, CLAPHAM
Charity number: 1134600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Paterson-Morgan | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry Chu | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Edge | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Olivier | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN NEWELL | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DONOHUE | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Loller | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Buchanan | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caitrin Robertson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Studdert | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Pollock | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Nicholas Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Granleese | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MAHONEY | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paula Wilson | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev RUTH ANNE BURGE-THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.