KARIS NEIGHBOUR SCHEME

Charity number: 1133510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £235.86k £244.63k £243.72k £201.81k £266.29k
Total expenditure £210.48k £214.73k £247.12k £229.78k £237.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £81.84k £0 £45.00k £19.09k
Income from government grants £18.00k £18.00k £18.50k £18.00k £36.14k