Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOPS CLEEVE
Charity number: 1135929
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Ann Barbour | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Natalie Garrett | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Mary Penn | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Julie Jolly | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Ann Hazell | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Dyer | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Shaw | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Blakey | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Stapledon Doody | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Powell | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Michael Garrett | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ruth Waller | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Kathleen Green | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Shaw | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Homes | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Hall | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kenneth Young | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Vincent Donovan | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jessop | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Lea | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ALLISON HUNT | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.