Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITSTABLE
Charity number: 1134171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
33 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Baker | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karol Janice Bailey | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Claudette Gayle | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Allan Barrows | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Francis Farnham | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Payne | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Aiken Arthur | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Arnold | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Poole | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES GOULD | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Howard Anthony Barker | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Ann Maria Price | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jack Rufus Greenhalf | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN REITH | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Edward Frank Neame | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE GEORGIOU | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Edinboro | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ELIZABETH BLASKETT | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAMIAN CROCOMBE | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paulette Joanne Stubbings | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|||||
KAREN McKANE | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON FULLER | Trustee | 05 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANE ROSALIE CLEMENTS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS GUY WIDDOWS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM WALLER | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND DREWITT | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Stephen Kemp | Trustee | 23 July 2011 |
|
|||||
Rev RACHEL CATHARINE WEBBLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev SIMON CHRISTOPHER TILLOTSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN FREDERICK LEGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH BOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA SUSAN Kemp | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA ELIZABETH ANN BOUCHERAT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.