Governing document SHERBORNE ARTS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 16 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- (1) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN ARTS CENTRE, GALLERY AND EXHIBITION SPACE; (2) PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE PARTICIPATION AND EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ARTS; AND (3) FOSTERING AND PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.