Trustees CAMBODIAN CHILDREN'S FUND UK
Charity number: 1135214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Axel Maier | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dan Roberts | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noni Ware | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Griffiths | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott Neeson | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Heginbottom | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Neale | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.