Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, RIPON, DIOCESE OF LEEDS
Charity number: 1135108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CHRISTOPHER BUTLER | Chair | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Bennington | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jed Bates | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Wilks | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michelle Yvonne Lepine | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sharma | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Cavell-Taylor | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Allison Ruth Clark | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bakes | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Colson | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donald Hanson | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacquie Fisher | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Judith Sture | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barry Crompton | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Metcalfe | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Abel | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phil Thomas | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY TOWERS | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.