HOPE CHURCH LUTON TRUST

Charity number: 1133954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £235.42k £254.35k £284.34k £273.58k £247.92k
Total expenditure £225.08k £215.83k £244.50k £268.94k £212.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £7.25k N/A N/A