Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH, WEST OXFORDSHIRE CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
51 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Paul Biggs BEd MSc | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Andrew Alastair Miller | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Leslie Beechey | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Carol Ann Port | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Douglas Brian Paxton | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Kilpatrick | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Claire Louise Walton | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Cecil Bentley FCCA | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
JANET IRENE HILTON | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Stephen Michael Bywater | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Hannant | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Lesley Elizabeth Sutherland BA | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Bywater BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Ian Mark Worrall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Frances Palmer | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony John Gibson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jason Cooke | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rosemary Jane Britton B Sc | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Woodcock | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Anne Robinson | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
David John Haley | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
BEATRICE MARY Willis | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE ANN TEE | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Karl Kevin Williams | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES HENRY Simpkins | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
Sheila Dorothy Farmer | Trustee | 22 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew John Gower | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|||||||
Frederick Reginald Ireland | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Frederick Cotton | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Louise Adams RGN Dip He | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Wareham | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
WENDY ATKINSON | Trustee | 08 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
Nigel James | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|||||||
MARY DORIS JORDAN | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Ann Milner | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
GILLIAN MARY BREAKSPEAR | Trustee | 11 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
JUDITH ANNE BUCKNALL BA | Trustee | 29 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||
ROY HENRY TOWNSEND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Andrew Thomas Pote LLB Hons | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WILLIAM ANTHONY SEEDHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Keith Early Crawford | Trustee |
|
||||||||
GILLIAN IRENE GRASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANN PAULIN WORRALL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID GODFREY RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANNE EMILY CRAWFORD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
KATHLEEN MILDRED ALBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANDREW JAMES MAISEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAWN ELIZABETH ELLEN HALEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EDWIN CHARLES FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Stella Georgina Bristow | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANN LOUISE JEROME | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.