Trustees INTERNATIONAL LYMPHOEDEMA FRAMEWORK
Charity number: 1134989
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR CHRISTINE JOY MOFFATT | Chair |
|
||||||
Suzanne Grace Murray | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jayne Gordon | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Collard | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martina Sykorova | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tonny Karlsmark | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melanie Jayne Thomas | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Howard Keast | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Isabelle Marie Quere | Trustee | 15 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
NURSE SUSAN JENSEN NORREGAARD | Trustee | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.