ROYAL MILITARY ACADEMY SANDHURST COMMANDANT'S FUND

Charity number: 1134698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £161.83k £4.96m £159.31k £225.50k £327.34k
Total expenditure £181.32k £251.73k £244.95k £468.94k £567.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £411 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £143.56k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £4.82m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £232.67k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £19.06k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £18.71k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £50.41k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £19.06k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A