ACTS COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1136590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £55.23k £86.28k £83.07k £119.31k £163.91k
Total expenditure £35.32k £91.11k £28.78k £73.78k £160.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k