THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY & ST MICHAEL'S, EGREMONT

Charity number: 1136966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Reay CertEd, BA Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Barbara Mary Gates Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Rev'd Dr Duncan Jackson BA BSc PhD Trustee 29 September 2020
EGREMONT SOUP KITCHEN FUND Received: On time
THE EGREMONT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE EGREMONT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Andrew Holland Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
GERRY CHRISTMASS Trustee None on record
DORIS DOWNTON Trustee None on record
Helen Taylor Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Anne Mawson Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Richard John Hardiman Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Judith Ann Holdsworth Trustee 09 April 2019 None on record
TIM TAYLOR Trustee 19 June 2012 None on record
Margaret Rogers M.B.E. Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Jane Holland Trustee 09 April 2019 None on record
Vivien Postlethwaite Trustee 10 April 2018 None on record
Rev Melanie Jayne Appleby Chair 22 January 2020 None on record
Carol Smith Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record