PRINCE PHILIP CENTRE PHAB CLUB LEEDS

Charity number: 500883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £48.61k £62.99k £58.58k £58.58k £107.36k
Total expenditure £124.70k £84.55k £66.52k £56.03k £32.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £13.24k £8.64k £8.64k £7.16k