Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, HINCKLEY
Charity number: 1136428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SIMON JOSEPH WEARN | Chair | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Louise Cartwright | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Pepper | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Thompson | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Les Rue | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Marshall | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill Priestley | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Prokipczuk | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN MARIE KING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.