Trustees KENT FILM FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1138581
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Carr | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mae Dobson | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Kelly-Thomas | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emlyn Gregory | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Blair | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Shepherd | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.