NORWOOD COMMUNITY GROUP SERVICES LIMITED

Charity number: 1136323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.78k £18.77k £23.25k £21.76k £14.48k
Total expenditure £21.85k £19.68k £19.89k £21.76k £14.08k
Income from government contracts £15.82k £18.47k £15.00k £13.50k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £7.00k £8.00k £13.75k