POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN CHURCH LEWISHAM

Charity number: 1136365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £71.43k £81.90k £74.87k £80.97k £78.95k
Total expenditure £75.77k £84.64k £75.41k £78.62k £75.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A