Trustees INDEPENDENT CANCER PATIENTS' VOICE
Charity number: 1138456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Chuter | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Isabel Grayson | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Flavel | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Mary Banks | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS FINCH | Trustee | 07 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MAIREAD MACKENZIE | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADRIENNE MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.