RESURRECTION LIFE CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1137881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £855.83k £776.62k £649.70k £811.42k £725.05k
Total expenditure £988.47k £915.23k £711.80k £737.95k £763.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £145.96k £220.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £403 £10 £2.04k £124.66k £5.17k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £855.42k £776.61k £647.66k £686.76k £719.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £4 £0 £0 £215
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £942.03k £906.28k £668.99k £737.95k £668.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.23k £8.95k £9.73k £5.80k £3.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £46.45k £8.95k £42.82k £0 £94.54k