KITOV LIMITED

Charity number: 1139039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.08k £18.95k £32.18k £65.63k £28.73k
Total expenditure £10.14k £18.07k £34.53k £41.62k £45.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A