Trustees CAMBRIAN HERITAGE RAILWAYS LIMITED
Charity number: 1139786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mathew Robert Higgins | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Harvey Ellson | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Green | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John McCracken | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Sanderson | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Rudd | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Lloyd Jones | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Bradley | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY OWEN (otherwise JENNY PICKSTOCK) FCILEx | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANDREW LLOYD WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MALCOLM DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.