Financial history ZERO GRAVITY KNOW NO LIMITS

Charity number: 1137422
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £143.22k £212.17k £189.43k £221.36k £178.15k
Total expenditure £157.21k £226.58k £211.15k £200.35k £180.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £43.58k £59.51k