Trustees UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE, KEYWORTH & DISTRICT
Charity number: 1138354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harrie William Cooke | Chair | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Vera Margaret Ryan | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Charles Bailey | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Neil Harding | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel John Boote | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Turnbull | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Marie Boote | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Oakley | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Helen Kirk | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Edward Pitfield | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robin Wilcockson | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER VINCENT BURNETT EDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.