Trustees EAST BERKSHIRE OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1140993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATALIE HAYLLOR | Chair | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Tidy | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Heffer | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Reid | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Cowie | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amy Williams | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hider | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Bruce | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES LOLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.