Trustees MERTHYR TYDFIL COLLEGE LIMITED
Charity number: 1140289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Sutton | Chair | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE EVANS | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Sandra Elzbieta Anestazja Parkitna | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Forster | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Morgan | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Walker | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Louise Powell | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ben Calvert | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Simon Argent | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Hamblin | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Thomas | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Katy Burns | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.