Accounts and annual returns BRITISH-BANGLADESH CULTURAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1140537
Charity reporting is overdue by 1814 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 353 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 353 days | |
Annual return | 02 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 718 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 718 days | |
Annual return | 02 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1083 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1083 days | |
Annual return | 02 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1448 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1448 days | |
Annual return | 02 July 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1814 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1814 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window