ADVENTURE PLAY HUB LTD

Charity number: 1141000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £120.28k £119.42k £119.89k £112.27k £109.06k
Total expenditure £146.95k £109.49k £116.76k £107.76k £122.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £9.71k £8.00k £12.00k £12.89k