HOPE CHURCH, IPSWICH

Charity number: 1137936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £476.66k £492.17k £549.41k £738.76k £899.90k
Total expenditure £336.93k £341.78k £448.91k £588.74k £898.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £145.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £528.28k £722.93k £833.51k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £9.77k £8.97k £50
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.49k £1.09k £606
Income - Other N/A N/A £9.87k £5.78k £65.73k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £448.91k £588.74k £898.94k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0