Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH STEVINGTON
Charity number: 1139161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOROTHY PATRICIA LENNIE | Chair |
|
||||||
Fiona Louise Muir-Howie | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Prentice | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Edward Strutt | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Prigmore | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANE ALEXANDRA MARY O'CONNOR | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jacqueline Elaine Curtis | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|||||
ROBERT ANDREW EADIE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.