Trustees THE HIVE (HALIFAX) LTD
Charity number: 1139757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael HARRISON | Chair | 04 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Hutchinson | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christian Magan | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Siobhen Stevenson | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Kay | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gill Shannon | Trustee | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
DERRICK JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.