Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALSALL WOOD, ST JOHN
Charity number: 1138950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Modupe Oni | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lisa Mitchell | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEAN KING | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pugh | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Worrallo | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN RIGBY | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Grainger | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH LAVENDER | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Arthur Grainger | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHARON LESLEY HODGETTS | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANET BARLEY | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLIN RUSSELL ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN ALICE CHRISTINE SEARS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE LILIAN BENFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.