Accounts and annual returns KITALE SCHOOL UGANDA

Charity number: 1139453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 January 2021 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 January 2021 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 November 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 November 2019 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window